Latest Articles
Loading...

Info Post
Multiplying a number by 11

The simplest mutiplication is the multiplication by number 11

Take,
Example 1: 12345 x 11


We have to just add the consequent numbers given on the left side to get
the answers and so


12345 x 11 = 1 / 1+2 /2+3 /3+4 /4+5 / 5
= 1 /3/5/7/9/5


Therefore 12345 x 11 = 135795


Example 2 : 3628418 x 11


= 3 / 3+6 / 6+2 / 2+8 / 8+4 /4+1 /1+8 /8
= 3/9/8/12/5/9/8
= 3/9/9/12/5/9/8

Therefore 3628418 x 11 = 39912598

1 comments:

Thank You for visiting Momscribe.com !
Your contribution is greatly appreciated.
Please feel free to subscribe to this blog either by Email or any methods listed on the right side of this content.

நன்றி ! மீண்டும் வருகை தாருங்கள் :)